Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
County Of Kern, filed a(n) Child Support - Family case against Martinez, Arni J, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts with Cynthia L. Loo presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 13, 2018 |
CategoryChild Support-Department Of Child Support Services |
Last RefreshedJanuary 21, 2024 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeChild Support |
Case Cycle Time926 days |
Rejection/Correction Notice
Date: August 28, 2020Rejection/Correction Notice
Date: November 10, 2020Rejection/Correction Notice
Date: September 14, 2020Rejection/Correction Notice
Date: September 17, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 22, 2024 | Hearing |
Motion - DCSS (Modification) 11/20/23 DCSS NOM MOD C/S H/C STND ORDR 3 MINORS Judge: Loo, Cynthia L. |
|
January 22, 2024 | Docket Event |
Motion - DCSS (Modification) 11/20/23 DCSS NOM MOD C/S H/C STND ORDR 3 MINORS |
|
December 13, 2023 | Hearing |
DCSS: Proof of Service by Mail NOM HRG 1/22/2024 |
|
December 13, 2023 | Docket Event |
DCSS: Proof of Service by Mail NOM HRG 1/22/2024 |
|
November 20, 2023 | Hearing |
Notice of Motion - Modification (DCSS) Re: 11/20/23 DCSS NOM MOD C/S H/C STND ORDR 3 MINORS Hearing Date: 01/22/24 Hearing Time: 08:00 AM Hearing Department/Division: A |
|
November 20, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice of Motion - Modification (DCSS) Re: 11/20/23 DCSS NOM MOD C/S H/C STND ORDR 3 MINORS Hearing Date: 01/22/24 Hearing Time: 08:00 AM Hearing Department/Division: A |
|
November 10, 2020 | Docket Event | Rejection/Correction Notice | |
September 24, 2020 | Hearing |
DCSS: Findings and Order After Hearing JUDICIAL REVIEW OF LICENSE DENIAL HRG 8/31/2020 Judge: Bittleston, Dawn |
|
September 24, 2020 | Docket Event |
DCSS: Findings and Order After Hearing JUDICIAL REVIEW OF LICENSE DENIAL HRG 8/31/2020 Judge: Bittleston, Dawn |
|
September 17, 2020 | Hearing | Rejection/Correction Notice |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.