Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
County Of Kern, filed a(n) Child Support - Family case against Burrell, Billy Iii, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts with McKnight, Ralph L., Jr. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 30, 2016 |
CategoryChild Support-Department Of Child Support Services |
Last RefreshedNovember 18, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeChild Support |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time124 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 07, 2017 | Hearing |
DCSS: Judgment re Parental Obligations (After Hrg) HRG 4/3/17 Judge: McKnight, Ralph L., Jr. |
|
April 07, 2017 | Docket Event |
DCSS: Judgment re Parental Obligations (After Hrg) HRG 4/3/17 Judge: McKnight, Ralph L., Jr. |
|
April 03, 2017 | Hearing |
Motion (DCSS) DCSS NOM JUDGMENT C/S H/C STND ORDERS 1 MINOR CONTINUED FROM 03/07/17 Judge: McKnight, Ralph L., Jr. |
|
April 03, 2017 | Docket Event |
Motion (DCSS) DCSS NOM JUDGMENT C/S H/C STND ORDERS 1 MINOR CONTINUED FROM 03/07/17 Judge: McKnight, Ralph L., Jr. |
|
March 09, 2017 | Hearing |
DCSS: Stipulation to Continue and Order Thereon
Judge: McKnight, Ralph L., Jr. |
|
March 07, 2017 | Hearing |
Motion (DCSS) DCSS NOM JUDGMENT C/S H/C STND ORDERS 1 MINOR Judge: Fielder, John L. |
|
March 07, 2017 | Docket Event |
Motion (DCSS) DCSS NOM JUDGMENT C/S H/C STND ORDERS 1 MINOR Judge: Fielder, John L. |
|
January 20, 2017 | Hearing |
Notice of Motion - Initial DCSS Re: DCSS NOM JUDGMENT C/S H/C STND ORDERS 1 MINOR Hearing Date: 03/07/17 Hearing Time: 8:00 AM Hearing Department/Division: A |
|
January 20, 2017 | Docket Event |
Notice of Motion - Initial DCSS Re: DCSS NOM JUDGMENT C/S H/C STND ORDERS 1 MINOR Hearing Date: 03/07/17 Hearing Time: 8:00 AM Hearing Department/Division: A |
|
December 20, 2016 | Hearing | Answer to Complaint |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.