Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Schulman Candace, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case represented by Mannis Joseph, against Firestone Marc, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts with Emily T. Spear presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateJanuary 27, 2017 |
CategoryDissolution W/O Minor Children (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 16, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions721 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
|
Case Cycle Time826 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 15, 2019 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
July 15, 2019 | Docket Event |
at 8:30 AM in Department 65, Spear, Emily T., Presiding Order to Show Cause re: Entry of Judgment - Off Calendar - No Appearance Judge: Emily T. |
|
May 03, 2019 | Docket Event |
Declaration - Service of Final Dec. of Disclosure Filed by Petitioner |
|
May 03, 2019 | Docket Event |
Declaration - Default FL170 Filed by Petitioner |
|
May 03, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice - Entry of Judgment Filed by Petitioner |
|
May 03, 2019 | Docket Event |
Judgment Filed by Petitioner |
|
March 27, 2019 | Docket Event |
Judgment Package Received - Stipulated Filed by Petitioner |
|
March 18, 2019 | Docket Event |
at 8:30 AM in Department 65, Spear, Emily T., Presiding Trial Setting Conference - Not Held - Continued - Court's Own Motion Judge: Emily T. |
|
March 18, 2019 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
March 12, 2019 | Docket Event |
Declaration - Service of Prelim & Final Dec of Disclosure Filed by Respondent |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.