Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Hernandez Sandra M., filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Hernandez Samuel M., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 28, 2016 |
CategoryDissolution W/O Minor Children (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions755 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
|
Case Cycle Time797 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 05, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice - Entry of Judgment | |
March 05, 2019 | Docket Event | Judgment | |
February 28, 2019 | Docket Event |
Declaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure Filed by Petitioner |
|
February 28, 2019 | Docket Event |
Stipulation - Waiver of Final Declaration of Disclosure Filed by Petitioner |
|
February 28, 2019 | Docket Event |
Declaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure Filed by Respondent |
|
February 28, 2019 | Docket Event |
Appearance, Stipulations and Waivers Filed by Petitioner |
|
February 28, 2019 | Docket Event |
Declaration - Default FL170 Filed by Petitioner |
|
January 22, 2019 | Docket Event |
Judgment Package Received - Stipulated (2/28/19 APPROVED ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
April 26, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice - Case Review Re: Judgment | |
April 13, 2017 | Docket Event |
Response (- On Behalf of: Respondent: Hernandez, Samuel - Filed and Entered on 2017-04-13 ) Filed by Respondent |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.