Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Gardner Melissa, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Gardner Daniel, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
||
Filing DateJune 30, 2015 |
CategoryDissolution W/O Minor Children (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions108 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
|
Case Cycle Time402 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 05, 2016 | Docket Event |
Notice - Entry of Judgment (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Gardner, Melissa ) Filed by Petitioner Filed by Petitioner |
|
August 05, 2016 | Docket Event |
Judgment (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Gardner, Melissa ) Filed by Petitioner Filed by Petitioner |
|
August 05, 2016 | Docket Event |
Judgment (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Gardner, Melissa ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
August 05, 2016 | Docket Event |
Notice - Entry of Judgment (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Gardner, Melissa ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
July 13, 2016 | Docket Event | Declaration - Default FL170 | |
June 24, 2016 | Docket Event | Judgment Package Received - Stipulated | |
May 06, 2016 | Docket Event | Judgment Package Received - Stipulated | |
March 25, 2016 | Docket Event | Judgment Package Received - Stipulated | |
February 16, 2016 | Docket Event | Judgment Package Received - Stipulated | |
February 09, 2016 | Docket Event | Stipulation - Waiver of Final Declaration of Disclosure |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.