Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Clemente Luis Michael, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Clemente Mybel Visaya, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
||
Filing DateMay 29, 2015 |
CategoryDissolution W/O Minor Children (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 03, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions104 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
|
Case Cycle Time231 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 15, 2016 | Docket Event | Notice - Entry of Judgment | |
January 15, 2016 | Docket Event | Judgment | |
November 20, 2015 | Docket Event | Declaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure (pet fdd 07-31-15 - Service Date on 2015-07-31 ) | |
November 20, 2015 | Docket Event | Declaration - Default or Uncontested Judgment FL230 | |
November 20, 2015 | Docket Event | Declaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure (pet fdd 07-31-15 - Service Date on 2015-07-31 ) | |
September 10, 2015 | Docket Event | Judgment Package Received - FC2336 | |
September 10, 2015 | Docket Event | Milestone 2 Completed (Entered Date: 09-17-15 ) | |
September 10, 2015 | Docket Event | Request - Enter Default FL165 | |
September 10, 2015 | Docket Event | Milestone 2 Completed (Entered Date: 09-17-15 ) | |
August 10, 2015 | Docket Event |
Notice - Acknowledgment of Receipt (Summons & Petition - On Behalf of: Petitioner: Clemente, Luis - Signed on 2015-07-31 ) Filed by Petitioner Filed by Petitioner |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.