Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Cephus Michellei, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Jallow Isatu, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts with Mark A. Weiss presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateApril 14, 2015 |
CategoryNullity W/O Minor Children (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions321 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
|
Case Cycle Time531 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 10, 2016 | Docket Event |
Judgment (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Cephus, Michellei ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
November 10, 2016 | Docket Event |
Notice - Entry of Judgment (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Cephus, Michellei ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
November 10, 2016 | Docket Event |
at 8:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Dept. - 64, Juhas, Mark A., Presiding Default Prove Up Trial - Judgment - Default After Prove Up Judge: Mark A. |
|
November 10, 2016 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
October 14, 2016 | Docket Event | Notice - Hearing | |
September 22, 2016 | Docket Event | 3rd Notice Sent (Entered Date: 09-22-16 ) | |
September 22, 2016 | Docket Event | Notice - Case Review Re: Judgment | |
April 14, 2016 | Docket Event | Declaration - Default FL170 (P ) | |
April 14, 2016 | Docket Event | Judgment Package Received - FC2336 | |
February 10, 2016 | Docket Event | Milestone 2 Completed (Entered Date: 02-18-16 ) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.