Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Vargas Mary L., filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case represented by Sterling Heather Elaine, against Azcarate Gilberto, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts with Shelley L. Kaufman presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateMay 29, 2015 |
CategoryDissolution W/ Minor Children (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedMay 21, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions1280 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
|
Case Cycle Time1308 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 24, 2022 | Hearing |
Department 65 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012 RFO - Child Support |
|
May 20, 2022 | Hearing |
in Department 65, Hernandez, Dennis F, Presiding RFO - Child Support - Not Held - Continued by Respondent Judge: Hernandez Dennis F |
|
May 20, 2022 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
May 19, 2022 | Docket Event |
Remote Appearance - Scheduled Filed by Petitioner |
|
May 19, 2022 | Docket Event |
Remote Appearance - Scheduled Filed by Respondent |
|
April 20, 2022 | Docket Event |
Declaration (Declaration Regarding Address Verification ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
April 20, 2022 | Docket Event |
Post-Judgment Request for Order Case Mgmt Statement FAM 119 (Post-Judgment Request for Order Case Mgmt Statement FAM 119 ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
April 20, 2022 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service - Mail (Proof of Service - Mail ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
April 01, 2022 | Docket Event | Court Order for Post-Judgment Requests for Orders FAM 120 | |
March 30, 2022 | Docket Event |
RFO/MTN - Child Support (RFO/MTN - Child Support ) Filed by Petitioner |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.