Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Xxxxxx Xxxxxxx, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case represented by Whitmarsh Michael L, against Squires Bryce, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts with Josephine L. Staton presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 22, 2015 |
CategoryDissolution W/ Minor Children (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Cycle Time1173 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 05, 2018 | Docket Event |
in Department 2C, Hymowitz, Laura, Presiding FCCR Conference - Off Calendar - No Appearance FCCR Conference - Off Calendar - No Appearance Judge: Hymowitz Laura |
|
November 05, 2018 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
November 05, 2018 | Docket Event |
at 1:30 PM in Department 2C, Hymowitz, Laura, Presiding FCCR Conference - Off Calendar - No Appearance Judge: Laura |
|
August 14, 2018 | Docket Event |
Request - Dismissal Filed by Petitioner Filed by Petitioner |
|
August 14, 2018 | Docket Event |
Request - Dismissal Filed by Petitioner |
|
August 07, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice - FCCR Conference (Notice by LASC ) | |
August 07, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice - FCCR Conference (Notice by LASC ) | |
August 10, 2017 | Docket Event | Notice - FCCR Conference (Notice by LASC ) | |
August 10, 2017 | Docket Event | Notice - FCCR Conference (Notice by LASC ) | |
September 22, 2016 | Docket Event | Notice - Case Review Re: Judgment |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.