Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Scarano Beltrania, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Scarano Amalfi, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 29, 2015 |
CategoryDissolution W/ Minor Children (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 18, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Cycle Time74 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 11, 2015 | Docket Event | Request - Dismissal | |
June 01, 2015 | Docket Event | Proof of Service of Summons (FL105/StatusConfNtc--RECEIVED ) | |
June 01, 2015 | Docket Event | Declaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure (p prelim only ) | |
June 01, 2015 | Docket Event | Declaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure (p prelim only ) | |
June 01, 2015 | Docket Event | Proof of Service of Summons (FL105/StatusConfNtc--RECEIVED ) | |
May 30, 2015 | Docket Event | Milestone 1 Completed (Entered Date: 06-25-15 ) | |
May 30, 2015 | Docket Event | Milestone 1 Completed (Entered Date: 06-25-15 ) | |
May 29, 2015 | Docket Event |
Order on Court Fee Waiver (FW-003) (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Scarano, Beltrania - Granted on 2015-05-29 ) Filed by Petitioner Filed by Petitioner |
|
May 29, 2015 | Docket Event |
Petition (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Scarano, Beltrania ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
May 29, 2015 | Docket Event |
Summons (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Scarano, Beltrania ) Filed by Petitioner Filed by Petitioner |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.