Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Morales Misael, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Ramos Maria Del C. Anacleto, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts with Josephine L. Staton presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 29, 2015 |
CategoryDissolution W/O Minor Children (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Cycle Time1256 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 05, 2018 | Docket Event |
at 1:30 PM in Department 2C, Hymowitz, Laura, Presiding FCCR Conference - Held - Case Dismissed Judge: Laura |
|
November 05, 2018 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
August 07, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice - FCCR Conference (Notice by LASC ) | |
August 10, 2017 | Docket Event | Notice - FCCR Conference (Notice by LASC ) | |
September 22, 2016 | Docket Event | 3rd Notice Sent (Entered Date: 09-22-16 ) | |
September 22, 2016 | Docket Event | Notice - Case Review Re: Judgment | |
March 24, 2016 | Docket Event | 2nd Notice Sent (Entered Date: 03-24-16 ) | |
March 24, 2016 | Docket Event | Notice - Case Review Re: Default | |
July 01, 2015 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service of Summons (FL105--PERSONAL - On Behalf of: Petitioner: Morales, Misael ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
June 15, 2015 | Docket Event | Milestone 1 Completed (Entered Date: 07-09-15 ) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.