Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Flores Margarito Gonzalez, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case represented by Alvarez Juan Leonel, against Tellez Maria Eva Vasquez, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts with Lynne R. Meredith presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateMay 29, 2015 |
CategoryDissolution W/O Minor Children (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions59 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
|
Case Cycle Time1944 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 23, 2020 | Docket Event |
in Department 65, Scaduto, Lynn H., Presiding Order to Show Cause Hearing - Held - Case Dismissed Order to Show Cause Hearing - Held - Case Dismissed Judge: Scaduto Lynn H. |
|
September 23, 2020 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
September 23, 2020 | Docket Event |
at 8:30 AM in Department 65, Scaduto, Lynn H., Presiding Order to Show Cause Hearing - Held - Case Dismissed Judge: Lynn H. |
|
June 09, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice - Continuance | |
November 05, 2018 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
November 05, 2018 | Docket Event |
in Department 2C, Hymowitz, Laura, Presiding FCCR Conference - Off Calendar - No Appearance FCCR Conference - Off Calendar - No Appearance Judge: Hymowitz Laura |
|
November 05, 2018 | Docket Event |
at 1:30 PM in Department 2C, Hymowitz, Laura, Presiding FCCR Conference - Off Calendar - No Appearance Judge: Laura |
|
August 07, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice - FCCR Conference (Notice by LASC ) | |
August 07, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice - FCCR Conference (Notice by LASC ) | |
August 10, 2017 | Docket Event | Notice - FCCR Conference (Notice by LASC ) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.