Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Strickfaden Diane, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Strickfaden Thomas M., represented by Barberis Patricia Frances, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts with Kathleen O. Diesman presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateJanuary 06, 2015 |
CategoryDissolution W/ Minor Children (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions411 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
|
Case Cycle Time474 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 21, 2016 | Docket Event |
Notice - Withdrawal of Attorney of Record (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Strickfaden, Diane ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
September 14, 2016 | Docket Event | Notice - Entry of Judgment (- Filed and Entered on 2016-09-14 ) | |
September 14, 2016 | Docket Event | Judgment (- Filed and Entered on 2016-09-14 ) | |
September 02, 2016 | Docket Event |
Declaration - Service of Final Dec. of Disclosure (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Strickfaden, Diane - Filed and Entered on 2016-09-02 ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
September 02, 2016 | Docket Event | Appearance, Stipulations and Waivers | |
September 02, 2016 | Docket Event | Declaration - Default FL170 (- Filed and Entered on 2016-09-02 ) | |
August 30, 2016 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
August 30, 2016 | Docket Event |
at 8:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Dept. - 27, Diesman, Kathleen O., Presiding Order to Show Cause re: Entry of Judgment - Off Calendar - Request of Attorney Judge: Kathleen O. |
|
July 13, 2016 | Docket Event | Assigned to Court (Entered Date: 07-21-16 ) | |
July 13, 2016 | Docket Event | Judgment Package Received After Hearing (sent to dept 27 on 07/14/16 ) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.