Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Najera Sergio, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Hequet Anna Maria, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts with Maren E. Nelson presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateMay 29, 2015 |
CategoryDissolution W/O Minor Children (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 08, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions315 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
|
Case Cycle Time406 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 08, 2016 | Docket Event | Notice - Entry of Judgment (- Filed and Entered on 2016-07-08 ) | |
July 08, 2016 | Docket Event | Judgment (- Filed and Entered on 2016-07-08 ) | |
July 08, 2016 | Docket Event | Judgment (- Filed and Entered on 2016-07-08 ) | |
July 08, 2016 | Docket Event | Notice - Entry of Judgment (- Filed and Entered on 2016-07-08 ) | |
June 28, 2016 | Docket Event | Declaration - Default FL170 | |
June 01, 2016 | Docket Event | Judgment Package Received - FC2336 | |
May 12, 2016 | Docket Event |
Declaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Najera, Sergio ) Filed by Petitioner Filed by Petitioner |
|
May 12, 2016 | Docket Event |
Declaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Najera, Sergio ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
April 08, 2016 | Docket Event | Judgment Package Received - FC2336 | |
April 04, 2016 | Docket Event | Request - Enter Default FL165 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.