Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Hovhannisyan Naira, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Chavdarian Sarkis, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
||
Filing DateMay 29, 2015 |
CategoryDissolution W/O Minor Children (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions39 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
|
Case Cycle Time238 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 22, 2016 | Docket Event | Judgment | |
January 22, 2016 | Docket Event | Notice - Entry of Judgment | |
January 12, 2016 | Docket Event | Declaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure | |
January 12, 2016 | Docket Event | Declaration - Default FL170 | |
November 23, 2015 | Docket Event | Judgment Package Received - FC2336 | |
November 03, 2015 | Docket Event | Declaration - Default FL170 | |
November 03, 2015 | Docket Event | Declaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure | |
July 07, 2015 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service of Summons (PERSONAL - On Behalf of: Petitioner: Hovhannisyan, Naira ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
July 07, 2015 | Docket Event | Request - Enter Default FL165 | |
July 07, 2015 | Docket Event | Judgment Package Received - FC2336 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.