Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Jun Mi Sook, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Jun Steve Ilseok, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
||
Filing DateMay 29, 2015 |
CategoryDissolution W/O Minor Children (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 04, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions91 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
|
Case Cycle Time189 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 04, 2015 | Docket Event | Declaration - Default FL170 | |
December 04, 2015 | Docket Event | Judgment | |
December 04, 2015 | Docket Event | Notice - Entry of Judgment | |
November 20, 2015 | Docket Event |
Declaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure (and final - On Behalf of: Petitioner: Jun, Mi - Filed and Entered on 2015-11-20 ) Filed by Petitioner Filed by Petitioner |
|
November 20, 2015 | Docket Event |
Declaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure (and final - On Behalf of: Petitioner: Jun, Mi - Filed and Entered on 2015-11-20 ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
August 28, 2015 | Docket Event | Judgment Package Received - FC2336 | |
August 14, 2015 | Docket Event | Proof of Service of Summons - Amended Petition (PERSONAL ) | |
August 14, 2015 | Docket Event | Milestone 2 Completed (Entered Date: 08-20-15 ) | |
August 14, 2015 | Docket Event | Request - Enter Default FL165 (RECEIVED ) | |
August 14, 2015 | Docket Event | Milestone 2 Completed (Entered Date: 08-20-15 ) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.