Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Stempler Marcy Lynn, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case represented by Leichter Alexandra, against Dagmi David, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts with Thomas T. Lewis presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateFebruary 11, 2015 |
CategoryDissolution W/O Minor Children (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 27, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions1491 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
|
Case Cycle Time1491 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 12, 2023 | Proof of Service - Mail - Proof of Service - Mail | ||
August 11, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice (withdrawal of lis pendens ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
June 03, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice - Acknowledgement of Receipt (JUDGMENT ENTERED 3.13.2019 ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
May 08, 2019 | Docket Event |
Abstract - of Judgment (re equalization payment $3,434,581 (three abstracts place in atty svc basket) ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
April 26, 2019 | Docket Event |
Abstract - of Judgment (equaliztion payment $3,434,581 ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
April 26, 2019 | Docket Event |
Abstract - of Judgment Filed by Petitioner |
|
April 26, 2019 | Docket Event |
Abstract - of Judgment (eqeualiztion payment $3,434,581 place on basket ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
April 12, 2019 | Docket Event |
Abstract - of Judgment (re Equalization ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
April 02, 2019 | Docket Event |
Stipulation and Order (RE 250/252 Bernard Sale Proceeds ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
March 13, 2019 | Docket Event | Judgment |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.