Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Sy Kalam Elaine, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case represented by Roxas Sandy Kaly, against Hu Yaosen, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 30, 2014 |
CategoryDissolution W/O Minor Children (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions94 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
|
Case Cycle Time216 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 03, 2015 | Docket Event | Judgment | |
August 03, 2015 | Docket Event | Notice - Entry of Judgment | |
July 08, 2015 | Docket Event | Declaration - Default FL170 | |
April 09, 2015 | Docket Event | Milestone 2 Completed (Entered Date: 04-23-15 ) | |
April 09, 2015 | Docket Event | Request - Enter Default FL165 (SOLO ) | |
April 03, 2015 | Docket Event | Judgment Package Received - Stipulated | |
April 02, 2015 | Docket Event |
Declaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure (- On Behalf of: Respondent: Hu, Yaosen ) Filed by Respondent |
|
April 02, 2015 | Docket Event |
Declaration - Service of Final Dec. of Disclosure (- On Behalf of: Respondent: Hu, Yaosen ) Filed by Respondent |
|
March 06, 2015 | Docket Event |
Declaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Sy, Kalam ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
March 06, 2015 | Docket Event |
Declaration - Service of Final Dec. of Disclosure (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Sy, Kalam ) Filed by Petitioner |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.