Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Viera Maria Esther, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Viera Walter M., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts with Maren E. Nelson presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 30, 2014 |
CategoryDissolution W/ Minor Children (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions241 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
|
Case Cycle Time722 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 21, 2016 | Docket Event | Notice - Entry of Judgment | |
December 21, 2016 | Docket Event | Judgment | |
November 04, 2016 | Docket Event | Declaration - Default FL170 | |
September 28, 2016 | Docket Event | Judgment Package Received - FC2336 | |
April 28, 2016 | Docket Event | Notice - Case Review Re: Judgment | |
April 28, 2016 | Docket Event | 3rd Notice Sent (Entered Date: 04-28-16 ) | |
April 28, 2016 | Docket Event | 3rd Notice Sent (Entered Date: 04-28-16 ) | |
December 23, 2015 | Docket Event | Judgment Package Received - FC2336 | |
December 08, 2015 | Docket Event | Declaration - Default FL170 (incomplete - Rejected on 2016-01-29 ) | |
December 08, 2015 | Docket Event | Declaration - Default FL170 (incomplete - Rejected on 2016-01-29 ) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.