Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Rubio Bautista Elena D, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Huerta Juan Carlos, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
||
Filing DateApril 08, 2014 |
CategoryDissolution W/O Minor Children (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions50 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
|
Case Cycle Time169 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 24, 2014 | Docket Event | Notice - Entry of Judgment | |
September 24, 2014 | Docket Event | Judgment | |
August 04, 2014 | Docket Event | Declaration - Default FL170 | |
May 28, 2014 | Docket Event | Judgment Package Received - FC2336 | |
May 19, 2014 | Docket Event | Milestone 2 Completed (Entered Date: 05-22-14 ) | |
May 15, 2014 | Docket Event | Request - Enter Default FL165 (SOLO ) | |
May 15, 2014 | Docket Event |
Declaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Rubio Bautista, Elena ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
May 15, 2014 | Docket Event |
Declaration - Service of Final Dec. of Disclosure (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Rubio Bautista, Elena ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
April 23, 2014 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service of Summons (PERSONAL - On Behalf of: Petitioner: Rubio Bautista, Elena ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
April 11, 2014 | Docket Event | Milestone 1 Completed (Entered Date: 05-01-14 ) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.