Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Manzo Brenda, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Manzo Miguel, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
||
Filing DateApril 08, 2014 |
CategoryDissolution W/ Minor Children (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 13, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions52 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
|
Case Cycle Time184 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 09, 2014 | Docket Event | Notice - Entry of Judgment | |
October 09, 2014 | Docket Event | Judgment | |
August 11, 2014 | Docket Event | Declaration - Default FL170 | |
May 30, 2014 | Docket Event | Judgment Package Received - FC2336 | |
May 27, 2014 | Docket Event | Milestone 2 Completed (Entered Date: 06-02-14 ) | |
May 27, 2014 | Docket Event | Milestone 2 Completed (Entered Date: 06-02-14 ) | |
May 23, 2014 | Docket Event | Request - Enter Default FL165 (SOLO ) | |
May 23, 2014 | Docket Event | Request - Enter Default FL165 (SOLO ) | |
May 15, 2014 | Docket Event |
Declaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Manzo, Brenda ) Filed by Petitioner Filed by Petitioner |
|
May 15, 2014 | Docket Event |
Declaration - Service of Final Dec. of Disclosure (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Manzo, Brenda ) Filed by Petitioner Filed by Petitioner |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.