Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Matelyan And William Frank, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Hayes Arika Auasha, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 08, 2014 |
CategoryDissolution W/O Minor Children (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 26, 2014 | Docket Event |
Request - Dismissal (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Matelyan And, William ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
August 20, 2014 | Docket Event |
Notice (of death of petitioner - On Behalf of: Petitioner: Matelyan And, William ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
May 21, 2014 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service (of response to marriage - On Behalf of: Respondent: Hayes, Arika ) Filed by Respondent |
|
May 12, 2014 | Docket Event | Milestone 2 Completed (Entered Date: 05-15-14 ) | |
May 12, 2014 | Docket Event |
Order on Court Fee Waiver (FW-003) (- On Behalf of: Respondent: Hayes, Arika - Granted on 2014-05-12 ) Filed by Respondent |
|
May 12, 2014 | Docket Event |
Fee Waiver - Request - Waive Court Fees - Filed FW001 (- On Behalf of: Respondent: Hayes, Arika ) Filed by Respondent |
|
May 12, 2014 | Docket Event | Response (- Filed and Entered on 2014-05-12 ) | |
April 08, 2014 | Docket Event |
Petition (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Matelyan And, William ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
April 08, 2014 | Docket Event |
Summons (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Matelyan And, William ) Filed by Petitioner |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.