Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Deremer Melissa Manchester, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case represented by Jamra Grace A, against Deremer Kevin Michael, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
||
Filing DateMay 24, 2012 |
CategoryPetition - Legal Separation (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions782 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
|
Case Cycle Time925 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 04, 2019 | Docket Event |
Order - Qualified Domestic Relations Order (re screen actors guild ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
October 11, 2019 | Docket Event |
Order - Qualified Domestic Relations Order (Equity-League Trust Fund certified and comform copy mail back ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
October 11, 2019 | Docket Event |
Order - Qualified Domestic Relations Order (AFTRA Reitirement Fund certifed and conform copy mail back ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
March 10, 2017 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte - Application (Restoration of Former Name After Entry of Judgment & Order RESTORED NAME: MELISSA MANCHESTER - On Behalf of: Petitioner: DeRemer, Melissa - Filed and Entered on 2017-03-10 ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
December 05, 2014 | Docket Event | Notice - Entry of Judgment | |
December 05, 2014 | Docket Event | Judgment | |
October 01, 2014 | Docket Event | Declaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure (By Petitioner ) | |
October 01, 2014 | Docket Event | Judgment Package Received After Hearing (By Petitioner package taken to the judgment unit by atty service ) | |
October 01, 2014 | Docket Event | Assigned to Court (Entered Date: 10-02-14 ) | |
September 26, 2014 | Docket Event | Stipulation - Waiver of Final Declaration of Disclosure |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.