Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Morales Jose Dolores, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Reyes Maria Guadalupe, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
||
Filing DateJanuary 27, 2010 |
CategoryDissolution W/O Minor Children (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions125 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
|
Case Cycle Time177 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 23, 2010 | Docket Event |
Notice - Entry of Judgment (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Morales, Jose ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
July 23, 2010 | Docket Event |
Judgment (3 - On Behalf of: Petitioner: Morales, Jose ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
July 23, 2010 | Docket Event |
Declaration - Default FL170 (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Morales, Jose ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
July 23, 2010 | Docket Event |
Declaration - Service of Final Dec. of Disclosure (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Morales, Jose ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
June 01, 2010 | Docket Event | Judgment Package Received - FC2336 | |
March 22, 2010 | Docket Event | Proof of Service of Summons (personal service ) | |
March 22, 2010 | Docket Event | Notice - Acknowledgment of Receipt (- Signed on 2010-01-30 ) | |
March 22, 2010 | Docket Event | Request - Enter Default FL165 | |
January 27, 2010 | Docket Event |
Petition (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Morales, Jose ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
January 27, 2010 | Docket Event |
Summons (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Morales, Jose ) Filed by Petitioner |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.