Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Pension Plan Motion Picture, Disney Roy E., filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case represented by Mosten Forrest Steven, against Disney Patricia, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts with Robert A. McSorley presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateJanuary 19, 2007 |
CategoryDissolution W/O Minor Children (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions333 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
|
Case Cycle Time333 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 14, 2008 | Docket Event | Order - Qualified Domestic Relations Order (re Disney Salaried Retirement Plan ) | |
July 14, 2008 | Docket Event | Order - Qualified Domestic Relations Order (re motion Picture Industry Pension Plan ) | |
July 14, 2008 | Docket Event | Order - Qualified Domestic Relations Order (re Walt Disney Productions and Associated Companies Key Enployees Deferred Compensation an d REstirement Plan ) | |
April 03, 2008 | Docket Event |
Joinder - Notice - Appear and Respond Employee Benefit Plan (- On Behalf of: Claimant: Pension Plan, Motion Picture ) Filed by Claimant |
|
April 01, 2008 | Docket Event |
Notice - Acknowledgment of Receipt (- On Behalf of: Respondent: Disney, Patricia - Signed on 2008-03-20 ) Filed by Respondent |
|
April 01, 2008 | Docket Event | Joinder - Notice - Appear and Respond Employee Benefit Plan | |
March 26, 2008 | Docket Event | Joinder - Notice - Appear and Respond Employee Benefit Plan | |
February 20, 2008 | Docket Event |
Joinder - Request for Joinder - Employee Benefit Plan (- On Behalf of: Respondent: Disney, Patricia ) Filed by Respondent |
|
December 18, 2007 | Docket Event | Appearance, Stipulations and Waivers | |
December 18, 2007 | Docket Event |
at 3:00 PM in Stanley Mosk Dept. - 2, Schnider, Robert A., Presiding Conference - Judgment - Granted Judge: Robert A. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.