Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Storey Timothy B, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case represented by Glavin William P Iv, against Storey Roxanne, represented by Goldsman Melvin Saul, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts with Michael P. Linfield presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMichael P. Linfield Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 05, 2005 |
CategoryDissolution W/O Minor Children (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Cycle Time90 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 05, 2005 | Docket Event |
at 8:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Dept. - 22, Linfield, Michael P., Presiding Order to Show Cause Hearing - Off Calendar - No Appearance Judge: Michael P. |
|
December 05, 2005 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
November 30, 2005 | Docket Event |
at 8:45 AM in Stanley Mosk Dept. - 22, Linfield, Michael P., Presiding Motion Hearing - Off Calendar - No Appearance Judge: Michael P. |
|
November 30, 2005 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
November 01, 2005 | Docket Event | Request - Dismissal | |
October 28, 2005 | Docket Event | Substitution of Attorney | |
October 19, 2005 | Docket Event |
Notice - Motion (11/30/05 - On Behalf of: Respondent: Storey, Roxanne ) Filed by Respondent |
|
October 19, 2005 | Docket Event |
Notice - Continuance (- On Behalf of: Respondent: Storey, Roxanne ) Filed by Respondent |
|
October 18, 2005 | Docket Event |
at 8:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Dept. - 22, Linfield, Michael P., Presiding Order to Show Cause Hearing - Held - Continued Judge: Michael P. |
|
October 18, 2005 | Docket Event | Minute Order |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.