Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Hill, Jerry Sr, Hill, Jerry Jr A Minor By Thought His Guardian Ad Litem Jerry Hill Sr, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case against San Francisco Bay Area Rapid Transit District, in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 30, 1995 |
CategoryPersonal Injury |
Last RefreshedJune 27, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationAlameda County, CA |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 11, 1997 | Docket Event | DROPPED FROM CALENDAR | |
May 19, 1997 | Docket Event | ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: STATUS OF GENERAL CIVIL CASE 07/11/1997 10:00:00 AM D-4 | |
May 15, 1997 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL, WITH PREJUDICE | |
May 09, 1997 | Docket Event | ORDER APPROVING COMPROMISE OF MINOR'S CLAIM | |
May 09, 1997 | Docket Event | MINUTES ON HEARING HELD BEFORE/AFTER TRIAL | |
April 29, 1997 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR MINOR COMPROMISE CLAIM Filed | |
April 29, 1997 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR MINOR COMPROMISE CLAIM 05/09/1997 09:00:00 AM D-5 | |
February 21, 1996 | Docket Event | ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED Filed For BAY AREA RAPID TRANSIT DISTRICT | |
February 02, 1996 | Docket Event | AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT FILED Filed For | |
January 25, 1996 | Docket Event | SUMMONS FILED WITH PROOF OF SERVICE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.