Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
RIVERA ET AL VS GUITRON
A 06-Cv Breach Of Contract/Warranty-Civil Unlimited case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Kern County. Judge Pulskamp, Gregory presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
April 26, 2024
Last Refreshed
May 07, 2024
Filing Location
Kern County, CA
Filing Court House
Superior Court of California
Category
06-CV Breach of Contract/Warranty-Civil Unlimited
Practice Area
Commercial
Matter Type
Breach of Contract
Status
Active
Overview
Causes of Action
COMPLAINT TO QUIET TITLE,
DAMAGES FOR BREACH OF
CONTRACT, AND CONSTRUCTIVE
TRUST
UNLIMITED CIVIL CASE
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Documents
Case Management Conference
Date: Oct 28, 2024Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110
Date: Aug 12, 2024Electronic Rejection Notice
Date: Apr 29, 2024Order to Show Cause
Date: Apr 29, 2024Electronic Rejection Notice
Date: Apr 29, 2024SUM-100
Date: Apr 29, 2024CM-010
Date: Apr 29, 2024FW-003
Date: Apr 26, 2024Req to Waive Fees Maria
Date: Apr 26, 2024FW-003 Gabriel
Date: Apr 26, 2024Req to Waive Fees Gabriel
Date: Apr 26, 2024Quiet Title Complaint
Date: Apr 26, 2024Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 28, 2024 | Docket Event |
Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C) Case Management Conference Judge: Pulskamp, Gregory |
|
August 12, 2024 | Docket Event |
Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C) Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 Judge: Pulskamp, Gregory |
|
April 30, 2024 | Docket Event | Summons Issued and Filed | |
April 29, 2024 | Docket Event |
Rejection/Correction Notice***SECOND REJECTION*** Electronic Rejection Notice SUMMONS: Party names do not conform EXACTLY to Complaint. |
|
April 29, 2024 | Docket Event |
Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C) Order to Show Cause Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 08/12/2024 Hearing Time: 8:30 am Hearing Department/Division: J |
|
April 29, 2024 | Docket Event |
Rejection/Correction Notice Electronic Rejection Notice Summons does not conform exact to Complaint. Please review Party information. Civil case cover sheet rejected due to multiple selections in item #1. Only one selection required. Please correct and re-file into existing case number. |
|
April 29, 2024 | Docket Event | Civil and Small Claims Documents | |
April 29, 2024 | Docket Event |
Initial Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted By Clerk as to Plaintiff Maria Isabel Trujillo |
|
April 29, 2024 | hearing | Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010) | |
April 29, 2024 | hearing |
Electronic Rejection Notice SUMMONS: Party names do not conform EXACTLY to Complaint. |
|
April 29, 2024 | hearing |
Order to Show Cause Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 08/12/2024 Hearing Time: 8:30 am Hearing Department/Division: J |
|
April 29, 2024 | hearing |
Electronic Rejection Notice Summons does not conform exact to Complaint. Please review Party information. Civil case cover sheet rejected due to multiple selections in item #1. Only one selection required. Please correct and re-file into existing case number. |
|
April 29, 2024 | hearing |
Initial Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted By Clerk as to Plaintiff Maria Isabel Trujillo |
|
April 29, 2024 | hearing |
Initial Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted By Clerk as to Plaintiff Gabriel Nunez Rivera |
|
April 29, 2024 | Docket Event |
Initial Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted By Clerk as to Plaintiff Gabriel Nunez Rivera |
|
April 29, 2024 | Docket Event | SUM-100 | |
April 29, 2024 | Docket Event | CM-010 | |
April 26, 2024 | Docket Event | Request to Waive Court Fees | |
April 26, 2024 | Docket Event | Complaint | |
April 26, 2024 | Docket Event | FW-003 | |
April 26, 2024 | Docket Event | Req to Waive Fees Maria | |
April 26, 2024 | Docket Event | FW-003 Gabriel | |
April 26, 2024 | Docket Event | Req to Waive Fees Gabriel | |
April 26, 2024 | Docket Event | Quiet Title Complaint |