Case Last Refreshed: 3 days ago
Cervantes, Ruben Ambriz, Hernandez, Jesus Hernandez, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Khoubian, Alexander, against General Motors Llc, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts Superior Court of California with Pulskamp, Gregory presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 23, 2024 |
Category06-Cv Breach Of Contract/Warranty-Civil Unlimited |
Last RefreshedMay 03, 2024 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court HouseSuperior Court of California |
This complaint involves a plaintiff who is an individual resident of California suing Defendant GENERAL MOTORS LLC for various violations. The plaintiff purchased a 2017 Chevrolet Volt from the defendant, which developed defects that substantially im...
Case Management Conference
Date: October 21, 2024Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110
Date: August 12, 2024Order to Show Cause
Date: April 24, 2024(32244591) Affidavit
Date: April 26, 2024Summons
Date: April 24, 2024Civil Case Coversheet
Date: April 24, 2024Complaint
Date: April 24, 2024Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 21, 2024 | Hearing |
Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C) Case Management Conference Judge: Pulskamp, Gregory |
|
August 12, 2024 | Docket Event |
Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C) Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 Judge: Pulskamp, Gregory |
|
April 26, 2024 | Docket Event | (32244591) Affidavit | |
April 24, 2024 | Docket Event | Civil and Small Claims Documents | |
April 24, 2024 | Hearing |
Order to Show Cause Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 08/12/2024 Hearing Time: 8:30 am Hearing Department/Division: J |
|
April 24, 2024 | Hearing | Summons Issued and Filed | |
April 24, 2024 | Docket Event |
Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C) Order to Show Cause Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 08/12/2024 Hearing Time: 8:30 am Hearing Department/Division: J |
|
April 24, 2024 | Docket Event | Summons | |
April 24, 2024 | Docket Event | Civil Case Coversheet | |
April 24, 2024 | Docket Event | Complaint |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.