Case Last Refreshed: 2 days ago
Phan, Dien Ngoc, filed a(n) General Property - Property case represented by Klinkert, James E, against Boehning, Annie Phuong Hong, Villalba, Yutsil, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts Superior Court of California with Smith, T presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 22, 2024 |
Category26-Cv Other Real Property-Civil Unlimited |
Last RefreshedMay 02, 2024 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Property |
Filing Court HouseSuperior Court of California |
Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110
Date: August 12, 2024Order to Show Cause
Date: April 22, 2024Case Management Conference
Date: October 21, 2024Complaint
Date: April 22, 2024Notice of pending action
Date: April 24, 2024Civil case cover sheet
Date: April 22, 2024Summons
Date: April 22, 2024Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 21, 2024 | Hearing |
Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C) Case Management Conference Judge: Smith, T. Mark |
|
August 12, 2024 | Docket Event |
Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C) Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 Judge: Smith, T. Mark |
|
April 24, 2024 | Docket Event | Notice of Lis Pendens | |
April 24, 2024 | Docket Event | Notice of pending action | |
April 22, 2024 | Docket Event |
Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C) Order to Show Cause Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 08/12/2024 Hearing Time: 8:30 am Hearing Department/Division: T-2 |
|
April 22, 2024 | Docket Event | Summons Issued and Filed | |
April 22, 2024 | Hearing | Civil and Small Claims Documents | |
April 22, 2024 | Hearing |
Order to Show Cause Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 08/12/2024 Hearing Time: 8:30 am Hearing Department/Division: T-2 |
|
April 22, 2024 | Hearing | Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010) | |
April 22, 2024 | Hearing | Complaint |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.