Case Last Refreshed: 3 days ago
Ross, Patrice, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Kidwell, Kevin A., against Alonzo, Fidenzio John, City Of Bakersfield, A Public Entity, Kern Body Transport, Llc, A Limited Liability Company, Zambrano Properties, Llc, A Limited Liability Company, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts Superior Court of California with Smith, T presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 17, 2024 |
Category23-Cv Other Pi/Pd/Wd - Civil Unlimited |
Last RefreshedApril 30, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
Filing Court HouseSuperior Court of California |
Electronic Rejection Notice
Date: April 19, 2024Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110
Date: August 12, 2024Order to Show Cause
Date: April 19, 2024Case Management Conference
Date: October 16, 20244.17.2024_CCCS_RossP
Date: April 22, 20244.17.2024_Summons_Ross
Date: April 17, 20244.17.2024_Complaint_RossP
Date: April 17, 2024Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 16, 2024 | Docket Event |
Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C) Case Management Conference Judge: Smith, T. Mark |
|
August 12, 2024 | Docket Event |
Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C) Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 Judge: Smith, T. Mark |
|
April 22, 2024 | Docket Event | 4.17.2024_CCCS_RossP | |
April 22, 2024 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010) | |
April 19, 2024 | Docket Event |
Rejection/Correction Notice Electronic Rejection Notice Mandatory form CM-010 revised as of 01/2024. Please file revised version into the existing case number. |
|
April 19, 2024 | Docket Event |
Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C) Order to Show Cause Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 08/12/2024 Hearing Time: 8:30 AM Hearing Department/Division: T-2 |
|
April 19, 2024 | Docket Event | Civil and Small Claims Documents | |
April 19, 2024 | Docket Event | Summons Issued and Filed | |
April 19, 2024 | Hearing |
Order to Show Cause Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 08/12/2024 Hearing Time: 8:30 AM Hearing Department/Division: T-2 |
|
April 19, 2024 | Hearing |
Electronic Rejection Notice Mandatory form CM-010 revised as of 01/2024. Please file revised version into the existing case number. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.