Case Last Refreshed: 23 hours ago
Schappert, Anthony Francis, filed a(n) 02-Cv Writ Of Mandate-Civil Unlimited case against Department Of Motor Vehicles, An Agency Of The State Of California, By And Through Its Director Steve Gordon, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts Superior Court of California with Pulskamp, Gregory presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 12, 2024 |
Category02-Cv Writ Of Mandate-Civil Unlimited |
Last RefreshedMay 03, 2024 |
|
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
|
Filing Court HouseSuperior Court of California |
Ex Parte Hearing - Pre-Disposition
Date: April 23, 2024Order Staying Suspension
Date: April 26, 2024DMV's Opposition to Ex Parte -- Schappert v. DMV
Date: April 22, 2024Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 13, 2024 | Hearing |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Pulskamp, Gregory |
|
April 26, 2024 | Docket Event | Order Staying Suspension | |
April 23, 2024 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte Hearing - Pre-Disposition 04/23/2024 Ex Parte Hearing - Pre-Disposition {Div J = Dark} Petitoner's Exparte application for Stay of suspension of Petitioner's Driver's License |
|
April 23, 2024 | Hearing |
Ex Parte Hearing - Pre-Disposition {Div J = Dark} Petitoner's Exparte application for Stay of suspension of Petitioner's Driver's License Judge: Barmann, Bernard C., Jr. |
|
April 22, 2024 | Hearing | Opposition to Exparte for stay of suspension of driving license | |
April 22, 2024 | Docket Event | Opposition to Exparte for stay of suspension of driving license | |
April 22, 2024 | Docket Event | DMV's Opposition to Ex Parte -- Schappert v. DMV | |
April 18, 2024 | Hearing |
Declaration of Marshall Hammons |
|
April 18, 2024 | Hearing |
Declaration of Jennifer Gil |
|
April 18, 2024 | Hearing |
Miscellaneous Filing Demand for Admin Record |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.