Case Last Refreshed: 4 days ago
Stepro, Gregory A., filed a(n) General Property - Property case represented by Estavillo, Jason W., against Gulf Harbour Investments Corporation, Specialized Loan Servicing, Llc, The Mortgage Law Firm, Plc, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts Superior Court of California with Barmann, Bernard C., Jr. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 12, 2024 |
Category26-Cv Other Real Property-Civil Unlimited |
Last RefreshedApril 25, 2024 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Property |
Filing Court HouseSuperior Court of California |
Case Management Conference
Date: October 14, 2024Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110
Date: August 12, 2024Ex Parte Hearing - Pre-Disposition
Date: April 17, 2024Order to Show Cause
Date: April 15, 2024Ex Parte Hearing - Pre-Disposition
Date: April 22, 202420240408_TRO_Proposed Order
Date: April 19, 202420240408_TRO_Client Decl-print
Date: April 19, 202420240419_Declaration_ACG
Date: April 19, 202420240408_TRO_MPA
Date: April 19, 202420240419_TRO App with POS
Date: April 19, 202420240416_TRO_Dec of ACG_DLC edits
Date: April 17, 202420240417_TRO Declaration
Date: April 17, 202420240417_Ntc of Recorded Notice of Lis Pendens
Date: April 17, 202420240416_TRO Ex Parte App 3
Date: April 16, 2024Client declaration
Date: April 16, 202420240408_TRO_Proposed Order
Date: April 16, 202420240416_TRO Ex Parte MPA
Date: April 16, 202420240411_Stepro-Complaint
Date: April 12, 202420240411_Stepro-Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: April 12, 202420240412_Stepro-Summons
Date: April 12, 2024Client declaration
Date: April 15, 202420240408_TRO_Proposed Order
Date: April 15, 202420240408_TRO_Dec of AC
Date: April 15, 202420240415_TRO-Ex Parte App
Date: April 15, 202420240408_TRO_MPA
Date: April 15, 2024Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 14, 2024 | Docket Event |
Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C) Case Management Conference Judge: Barmann, Bernard C., Jr. |
|
August 12, 2024 | Hearing |
Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C) Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 Judge: Barmann, Bernard C., Jr. |
|
May 21, 2024 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause (Pre-Disposition) set by Court 04/22/24 to show cause why a preliminary injunction should not be issued |
|
May 21, 2024 | Hearing |
Order to Show Cause (Pre-Disposition) set by Court 04/22/24 to show cause why a preliminary injunction should not be issued Judge: Barmann, Bernard C., Jr. |
|
April 22, 2024 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte Hearing - Pre-Disposition 04/22/2024 Ex Parte Hearing - Pre-Disposition 4/19- Plaintiff Application for TRO and OSC for Prelim Injuinction |
|
April 22, 2024 | Docket Event |
Order on Motion Order Granting Ex Parte Application for Temporary Restraining Order to Cancel and Enjoin Sale of Subject Real Property and Order to Show Cause Re: Preliminary Injunction |
|
April 22, 2024 | Hearing |
Order on Motion Order Granting Ex Parte Application for Temporary Restraining Order to Cancel and Enjoin Sale of Subject Real Property and Order to Show Cause Re: Preliminary Injunction Judge: Barmann, Bernard C., Jr. |
|
April 22, 2024 | Hearing |
Ex Parte Hearing - Pre-Disposition 4/19- Plaintiff Application for TRO and OSC for Prelim Injuinction Judge: Barmann, Bernard C., Jr. |
|
April 22, 2024 | Hearing |
Court Use Only - Pre-Cleared Ex Parte DUE 4/19 NOON. Plaintiff Application for TRO and OSC for Prelim Injuinction; Ali 510 281 0068 Judge: Barmann, Bernard C., Jr. |
|
April 22, 2024 | Docket Event |
Court Use Only - Pre-Cleared Ex Parte DUE 4/19 NOON. Plaintiff Application for TRO and OSC for Prelim Injuinction; Ali 510 281 0068 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.