Case Last Refreshed: 2 weeks ago
Gonzalez, Antonio Hernandez, Hernandez-Lara, Isabel, Kaufman, Aiden, Lara, Virginia, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Ledgard, Don K, against Frayre, Cynthia, Frayre, Jasmine Ariana, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts Superior Court of California with Pulskamp, Gregory presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 09, 2024 |
Category22-Cv Auto - Civil Unlimited |
Last RefreshedApril 16, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court HouseSuperior Court of California |
Electronic Rejection Notice
Date: April 10, 2024Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110
Date: July 24, 2024Case Management Conference
Date: October 07, 2024Order to Show Cause
Date: April 10, 2024Complaint_Antonio
Date: April 09, 2024CCCS_Antonio
Date: April 09, 2024Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 07, 2024 | Docket Event |
Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C) Case Management Conference Judge: Pulskamp, Gregory |
|
July 24, 2024 | Docket Event |
Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C) Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 Judge: Pulskamp, Gregory |
|
April 10, 2024 | Docket Event |
Rejection/Correction Notice Electronic Rejection Notice Applications for appointment of GAL missing signature date under penalty of perjury. Please review/correct and re-file along with Proposed Orders Appointing GAL's and Summons. |
|
April 10, 2024 | Docket Event | Civil and Small Claims Documents | |
April 10, 2024 | Docket Event |
Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C) Order to Show Cause Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 07/24/2024 Hearing Time: 8:30 AM Hearing Department/Division: J |
|
April 10, 2024 | Hearing |
Order to Show Cause Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 07/24/2024 Hearing Time: 8:30 AM Hearing Department/Division: J |
|
April 10, 2024 | Hearing |
Electronic Rejection Notice Applications for appointment of GAL missing signature date under penalty of perjury. Please review/correct and re-file along with Proposed Orders Appointing GAL's and Summons. |
|
April 09, 2024 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010) | |
April 09, 2024 | Docket Event | Complaint | |
April 09, 2024 | Docket Event | Complaint_Antonio |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.