Case Last Refreshed: 2 days ago
Foster, Lacey Nicole, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Mosley, Jehrid S, Vaziri, Siamak, against Montelongo, Mia Teresa, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts Superior Court of California with Clark, Thomas S. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 08, 2024 |
Category23-Cv Other Pi/Pd/Wd - Civil Unlimited |
Last RefreshedApril 29, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
Filing Court HouseSuperior Court of California |
This complaint is a legal case filed by Plaintiff Lacey Nicole Foster against Defendant Mia Teresa Montelongo and Does 1 through 25 for damages related to negligence. The incident occurred on April 6, 2023, at an intersection in Bakersfield, Californ...
Order to Show Cause
Date: April 10, 2024Case Management Conference
Date: October 07, 2024Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110
Date: July 24, 202496453Proof0040f1
Date: April 22, 20244.8.2024_CCCS_Foster
Date: April 10, 202404-8-24_Complaint_LaceyNicoleFoster
Date: April 09, 20244.8.2024_Summons_Foster
Date: April 09, 2024Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 07, 2024 | Docket Event |
Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C) Case Management Conference Judge: Clark, Thomas S. |
|
July 24, 2024 | Docket Event |
Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C) Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 Judge: Clark, Thomas S. |
|
April 22, 2024 | Docket Event | 96453Proof0040f1 | |
April 10, 2024 | Docket Event | Summons Issued and Filed | |
April 10, 2024 | Docket Event |
Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C) Order to Show Cause Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 07/24/2024 Hearing Time: 8:30 am Hearing Department/Division: 17 |
|
April 10, 2024 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010) | |
April 10, 2024 | Docket Event | Civil and Small Claims Documents | |
April 10, 2024 | Hearing |
Order to Show Cause Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 07/24/2024 Hearing Time: 8:30 am Hearing Department/Division: 17 |
|
April 10, 2024 | Docket Event | 4.8.2024_CCCS_Foster | |
April 09, 2024 | Docket Event | 04-8-24_Complaint_LaceyNicoleFoster |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.