Case Last Refreshed: 4 days ago
Olson, Amber Hope, filed a(n) Malpractice - Torts case against Kern Medical Center Hospital, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts Superior Court of California with Barmann, Bernard C., Jr. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 22, 2024 |
Category45-Cv Medical Malpractice - Civil Unlimited |
Last RefreshedApril 26, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeMalpractice |
Filing Court HouseSuperior Court of California |
Electronic Rejection Notice
Date: April 25, 2024Electronic Rejection Notice
Date: April 24, 2024Case Management Conference
Date: September 23, 2024Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110
Date: July 08, 2024Order to Show Cause
Date: March 25, 2024General Denial - AO
Date: April 23, 2024Denial
Date: April 22, 2024Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 23, 2024 | Hearing |
Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C) Case Management Conference Judge: Barmann, Bernard C., Jr. |
|
July 08, 2024 | Hearing |
Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C) Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 Judge: Barmann, Bernard C., Jr. |
|
April 25, 2024 | Docket Event |
Rejection/Correction Notice Electronic Rejection Notice General Denial - Caption does not conform exact to complaint. *Erroneously sued as name listed does not conform to party listed in complaint. *Branch name listed is incorrect * Incorrect address listed. Correct court address is 1215 Truxtun Ave. |
|
April 25, 2024 | Hearing |
Electronic Rejection Notice General Denial - Caption does not conform exact to complaint. *Erroneously sued as name listed does not conform to party listed in complaint. *Branch name listed is incorrect * Incorrect address listed. Correct court address is 1215 Truxtun Ave. |
|
April 24, 2024 | Docket Event |
Rejection/Correction Notice Electronic Rejection Notice General Denial |
|
April 24, 2024 | Hearing |
Electronic Rejection Notice General Denial |
|
April 23, 2024 | Docket Event | General Denial - AO | |
April 22, 2024 | Hearing |
Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint as to Kern Medical Center Hospital via personal service |
|
April 22, 2024 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint as to Kern Medical Center Hospital via personal service |
|
April 22, 2024 | Docket Event | Denial |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.