Case Last Refreshed: 2 weeks ago
Calvi, Christopher J, Calvi, Robin M, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Carvalho, Tionna G., against Ford Motor Company, Jim Charlon Ford Inc, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts Superior Court of California with Pulskamp, Gregory presiding.
Case Number |
JudgePulskamp, Gregory Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 18, 2024 |
Category06-Cv Breach Of Contract/Warranty-Civil Unlimited |
Last RefreshedApril 09, 2024 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court HouseSuperior Court of California |
Case Management Conference
Date: September 18, 2024Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110
Date: July 08, 2024Order to Show Cause
Date: March 22, 202495087Proof0098a6
Date: April 02, 202494834Proof00ebd8
Date: March 28, 202494099Summo02f171
Date: March 18, 202494099Civil015cd2
Date: March 18, 202494099COMPL001d75
Date: March 18, 2024Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 18, 2024 | Hearing |
Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C) Case Management Conference Judge: Pulskamp, Gregory |
|
July 08, 2024 | Hearing |
Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C) Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 Judge: Pulskamp, Gregory |
|
April 02, 2024 | Docket Event | 95087Proof0098a6 | |
March 28, 2024 | Hearing |
Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint as to Ford Motor Company via personal service |
|
March 28, 2024 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint as to Ford Motor Company via personal service |
|
March 28, 2024 | Docket Event | 94834Proof00ebd8 | |
March 22, 2024 | Docket Event |
Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C) Order to Show Cause Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 07/08/2024 Hearing Time: 8:30 am Hearing Department/Division: J |
|
March 22, 2024 | Hearing | Civil and Small Claims Documents | |
March 22, 2024 | Hearing |
Order to Show Cause Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 07/08/2024 Hearing Time: 8:30 am Hearing Department/Division: J |
|
March 22, 2024 | Hearing | Summons Issued and Filed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.