Case Last Refreshed: 3 weeks ago
Sotelo, Norberto, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by O'Connell, Gregory, against Torres, David, Torres, Efrain, Torres, Yesenia, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts Superior Court of California with Pulskamp, Gregory presiding.
Case Number |
JudgePulskamp, Gregory Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 29, 2024 |
Category22-Cv Auto - Civil Unlimited |
Last RefreshedApril 04, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court HouseSuperior Court of California |
This complaint is a civil case cover sheet and summons for the case Sotelo vs Torres et al, with the case number BCV-24-100731. The document outlines various reasons for returning the attached papers, including issues such as the pleading not appeari...
Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110
Date: June 18, 2024Electronic Rejection Notice
Date: March 05, 2024Electronic Rejection Notice
Date: March 27, 2024Order to Show Cause
Date: March 05, 2024Case Management Conference
Date: September 03, 202494809Summo02968d
Date: March 27, 202494809Civil01609e
Date: March 27, 202494809Compl002638
Date: March 27, 202494559Civil01c070
Date: March 25, 202494559Compl002346
Date: March 25, 202494559Summo02d249
Date: March 25, 202492994Compl00c560
Date: February 29, 2024Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 03, 2024 | Docket Event |
Case Number Case Management Conference Judge: Pulskamp, Gregory |
|
June 18, 2024 | Docket Event |
Case Number Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 Judge: Pulskamp, Gregory |
|
March 28, 2024 | Docket Event | Summons Issued and Filed | |
March 27, 2024 | Docket Event |
Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010) Civil Case Cover Sheet (Comment) |
|
March 27, 2024 | Docket Event |
Case Number Electronic Rejection Notice If attempting to amend the existing Complaint, please specify that. |
|
March 27, 2024 | Hearing |
Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010) Civil Case Cover Sheet (Comment) |
|
March 27, 2024 | Hearing |
Rejection/Correction Notice Re. Civil Case Cover Sheet- Outdated form used. Please use CM-010 effective 1/01/2024. Re. Summons- Notice to Defendant, please make sure the does verbiage matches exact to the Complaint. |
|
March 27, 2024 | Hearing |
Electronic Rejection Notice If attempting to amend the existing Complaint, please specify that. |
|
March 27, 2024 | Docket Event |
Case Number Rejection/Correction Notice Re. Civil Case Cover Sheet- Outdated form used. Please use CM-010 effective 1/01/2024. Re. Summons- Notice to Defendant, please make sure the does verbiage matches exact to the Complaint. |
|
March 27, 2024 | Docket Event | 94809Summo02968d |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.