Case Last Refreshed: 1 week ago
Delgado, Christine Roshelle, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Hall, John C, against Dunkel, Betsy Renee, represented by Mitchell, Nicole Y, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts Superior Court of California with Smith, T presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSmith, T Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 28, 2024 |
Category22-Cv Auto - Civil Unlimited |
Last RefreshedApril 18, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court HouseSuperior Court of California |
Case Management Conference
Date: August 28, 2024Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110
Date: June 14, 2024Electronic Rejection Notice
Date: April 10, 2024Electronic Rejection Notice
Date: April 03, 2024Order to Show Cause
Date: March 01, 202495804Notic02987d
Date: April 11, 202495804Answe00ce4d
Date: April 11, 202495804Deman011a82
Date: April 11, 2024Notice of Unavailability of Counsel 2024
Date: April 11, 202495673Deman029d9a
Date: April 10, 202495673Answe003c1e
Date: April 10, 202495673Notic016190
Date: April 10, 2024POS of S&C
Date: March 26, 2024Proof of Service of Summons - Besty Renee Dunkel
Date: March 18, 2024Complaint
Date: February 29, 2024Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: February 29, 2024Summons
Date: February 29, 2024Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 28, 2024 | Docket Event |
Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C) Case Management Conference Judge: Smith, T. Mark |
|
June 14, 2024 | Docket Event |
Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C) Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 Judge: Smith, T. Mark |
|
April 11, 2024 | Docket Event | Notice of Posting Non-Refundable Jury Fees | |
April 11, 2024 | Docket Event | Answer to Complaint | |
April 11, 2024 | Docket Event | Demand for Jury | |
April 11, 2024 | Docket Event | Notice of Unavailability of Counsel | |
April 11, 2024 | Docket Event | 95804Notic02987d | |
April 11, 2024 | Docket Event | 95804Answe00ce4d | |
April 11, 2024 | Docket Event | 95804Deman011a82 | |
April 11, 2024 | Docket Event | Notice of Unavailability of Counsel 2024 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.