Case Last Refreshed: 12 hours ago
Velez, Javier, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Klitzke, Michael A., against Catano'S Auto Sales &Amp; Repair, Inc., Hudson Insurance Company, Valley Strong Credit Union, represented by Street, Nicholas J, Vaughn, Mark A, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts Superior Court of California with Clark, Thomas S. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 28, 2024 |
Category37-Cv Other Contract-Civil Unlimited |
Last RefreshedMay 03, 2024 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court HouseSuperior Court of California |
The complaint filed by Plaintiff Javier Velez against Defendants Catano's Auto Sales & Repair, Inc., Valley Strong Credit Union, Hudson Insurance Company, and Does 1 through 75 alleges multiple violations including Violation of the Consumers Legal Re...
Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110
Date: June 13, 2024Case Management Conference
Date: August 27, 2024Complaint
Date: February 28, 2024Order to Show Cause
Date: February 29, 2024POS_Valley_Strong
Date: April 29, 2024POS_Hudson
Date: April 29, 2024POS_Catano_s
Date: April 29, 2024ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (Final)
Date: April 23, 2024AoV
Date: February 28, 2024Summons
Date: February 28, 2024Civil_Case_Cover_Sheet_signed_
Date: February 28, 2024Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 27, 2024 | Hearing |
Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C) Case Management Conference Judge: Clark, Thomas S. |
|
June 13, 2024 | Docket Event |
Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C) Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 Judge: Clark, Thomas S. |
|
April 29, 2024 | Docket Event | POS_Valley_Strong | |
April 29, 2024 | Docket Event | POS_Hudson | |
April 29, 2024 | Docket Event | POS_Catano_s | |
April 23, 2024 | Hearing | Answer to Complaint | |
April 23, 2024 | Docket Event | ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (Final) | |
February 29, 2024 | Docket Event | Civil and Small Claims Documents | |
February 29, 2024 | Hearing |
Order to Show Cause Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 06/13/2024 Hearing Time: 8:30 AM Hearing Department/Division: 17 |
|
February 29, 2024 | Hearing | Summons Issued and Filed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.