Case Last Refreshed: 4 days ago
Lopez, Ana, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Geoulla, Daniel D, Samooha, Nathan, against Perez, Laura A., Sanchez, Laura, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts Superior Court of California with Pulskamp, Gregory presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 23, 2024 |
Category23-Cv Other Pi/Pd/Wd - Civil Unlimited |
Last RefreshedMay 01, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
Filing Court HouseSuperior Court of California |
Order to Show Cause
Date: February 29, 2024Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110
Date: June 13, 2024Case Management Conference
Date: August 27, 20244.23.24 scan ntc remote
Date: April 23, 20244.23.24 scan ntc dep
Date: April 23, 20244.23.24 scan ans to comp
Date: April 23, 2024POS Laura A. Perez
Date: April 01, 2024POS Laura Sanchez
Date: April 01, 2024Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 27, 2024 | Docket Event |
Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C) Case Management Conference Judge: Pulskamp, Gregory |
|
June 13, 2024 | Docket Event |
Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C) Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 Judge: Pulskamp, Gregory |
|
April 23, 2024 | Docket Event | 4.23.24 scan ntc remote | |
April 23, 2024 | Docket Event | 4.23.24 scan ntc dep | |
April 23, 2024 | Docket Event | 4.23.24 scan ans to comp | |
April 23, 2024 | Docket Event |
Notice of Remote Appearance (RA-010) Defendant's Notice of Remote Appearance |
|
April 23, 2024 | Docket Event | Notice of Posting Non-Refundable Jury Fees | |
April 23, 2024 | Docket Event | Answer to Complaint | |
April 23, 2024 | Hearing |
Notice of Remote Appearance (RA-010) Defendant's Notice of Remote Appearance |
|
April 02, 2024 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint as to Laura Sanchez via personal service |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.