Case Last Refreshed: 2 weeks ago
Zenith Insurance Company, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Ernst, David D, Williams, Jeffrey J, against Fuller, Julie Ann, Mcnutt, Brittany Morgan, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts Superior Court of California with Smith, T presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 23, 2024 |
Category22-Cv Auto - Civil Unlimited |
Last RefreshedApril 16, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court HouseSuperior Court of California |
Order to Show Cause
Date: February 23, 2024Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110
Date: June 07, 2024Electronic Rejection Notice
Date: February 23, 2024Case Management Conference
Date: August 21, 2024Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: April 09, 2024Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 21, 2024 | Docket Event |
Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C) Case Management Conference Judge: Smith, T. Mark |
|
June 07, 2024 | Docket Event |
Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C) Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 Judge: Smith, T. Mark |
|
April 09, 2024 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010) | |
April 09, 2024 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet | |
February 23, 2024 | Docket Event | Civil and Small Claims Documents | |
February 23, 2024 | Docket Event |
Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C) Order to Show Cause Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 06/07/2024 Hearing Time: 8:30 am Hearing Department/Division: T-2 |
|
February 23, 2024 | Docket Event |
Electronic Rejection Notice Civil Case Cover Sheet is incomplete. Missing #5. |
|
February 23, 2024 | Docket Event | Summons Issued and Filed | |
February 23, 2024 | Docket Event | Complaint | |
February 23, 2024 | Hearing |
Order to Show Cause Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 06/07/2024 Hearing Time: 8:30 am Hearing Department/Division: T-2 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.