Case Last Refreshed: 1 week ago
Poon, Blayne, Poon, Hannah Louise, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Hall, John C, against Bains, Harmandeep Kaur, represented by Mcmahon, Kerry M., in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts Superior Court of California with Pulskamp, Gregory presiding.
Case Number |
JudgePulskamp, Gregory Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 13, 2024 |
Category22-Cv Auto - Civil Unlimited |
Last RefreshedApril 17, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court HouseSuperior Court of California |
Order to Show Cause
Date: February 14, 2024Case Management Conference
Date: August 12, 2024Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110
Date: May 29, 2024Electronic Rejection Notice
Date: April 03, 2024Complaint
Date: February 13, 2024Notice of Unavailability 2024
Date: April 10, 2024BCV_24_100504_Notice_of_Jury_Fee_Deposit
Date: April 01, 2024BCV_24_100504_Answer_to_emand_for_Jury_Trial
Date: April 01, 2024POS of Summons
Date: March 26, 2024Proof of Service of Summons - Harmandeep Kaur Bains
Date: March 18, 2024Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: February 13, 2024Summons
Date: February 13, 2024Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 12, 2024 | Hearing |
Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C) Case Management Conference Judge: Pulskamp, Gregory |
|
May 29, 2024 | Hearing |
Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C) Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 Judge: Pulskamp, Gregory |
|
April 10, 2024 | Hearing | Notice of Unavailability of Counsel | |
April 10, 2024 | Docket Event | Notice of Unavailability 2024 | |
April 03, 2024 | Docket Event |
Rejection/Correction Notice Electronic Rejection Notice re; Proof of Service |
|
April 03, 2024 | Hearing |
Electronic Rejection Notice re; Proof of Service |
|
April 02, 2024 | Hearing | Notice of Posting Non-Refundable Jury Fees | |
April 02, 2024 | Hearing | Answer to Complaint | |
April 01, 2024 | Docket Event | BCV_24_100504_Notice_of_Jury_Fee_Deposit | |
April 01, 2024 | Docket Event | BCV_24_100504_Answer_to_emand_for_Jury_Trial |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.