Case Last Refreshed: 2 months ago
filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts with Smith, T presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 02, 2024 |
Category23-Cv Other Pi/Pd/Wd - Civil Unlimited |
Last RefreshedFebruary 09, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110
Date: May 20, 2024Case Management Conference
Date: August 05, 2024Order to Show Cause
Date: February 05, 202491278Civil022971
Date: February 02, 202491278Summo01ef24
Date: February 02, 202491278Compl0013a7
Date: February 02, 2024Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 05, 2024 | Docket Event |
Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C) Case Management Conference Judge: Smith, T. Mark |
|
May 20, 2024 | Docket Event |
Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C) Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 Judge: Smith, T. Mark |
|
February 05, 2024 | Docket Event |
Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C) Order to Show Cause Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 05/20/2024 Hearing Time: 8:30 am Hearing Department/Division: T2 |
|
February 05, 2024 | Docket Event | Summons Issued and Filed | |
February 05, 2024 | Hearing | Civil and Small Claims Documents | |
February 05, 2024 | Hearing |
Order to Show Cause Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 05/20/2024 Hearing Time: 8:30 am Hearing Department/Division: T2 |
|
February 02, 2024 | Docket Event | Complaint | |
February 02, 2024 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010) | |
February 02, 2024 | Docket Event | 91278Civil022971 | |
February 02, 2024 | Docket Event | 91278Summo01ef24 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.