Case Last Refreshed: 1 month ago
Insurance Company Of The West, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Yannone, Nathan R., against Ramos, Luz Elenia, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts with Clark, Thomas S. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 02, 2024 |
Category23-Cv Other Pi/Pd/Wd - Civil Unlimited |
Last RefreshedMarch 07, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110
Date: May 17, 2024Electronic Rejection Notice
Date: February 02, 2024Electronic Rejection Notice
Date: March 01, 2024Order to Show Cause
Date: February 02, 2024Electronic Rejection Notice
Date: February 02, 2024Case Management Conference
Date: July 31, 2024Proof of Service of Summons- Luz Elenia Ramos
Date: March 01, 2024Proof of Hand Delivery
Date: February 21, 2024Proof of Personal Service- Notice of Action
Date: February 16, 2024civil_cover_sheet_1 (1)
Date: February 02, 2024Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 31, 2024 | Docket Event |
Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C) Case Management Conference Judge: Clark, Thomas S. |
|
May 17, 2024 | Docket Event |
Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C) Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 Judge: Clark, Thomas S. |
|
March 01, 2024 | Docket Event |
Rejection/Correction Notice Electronic Rejection Notice re; Proof of Service |
|
March 01, 2024 | Hearing |
Electronic Rejection Notice re; Proof of Service |
|
March 01, 2024 | Docket Event | Proof of Service of Summons- Luz Elenia Ramos | |
February 21, 2024 | Docket Event | Proof of Hand Delivery | |
February 16, 2024 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service of Notice of Action Pursuant to Labor Code 3853, Complaint, as to Geovanny Cifuentes |
|
February 16, 2024 | Hearing |
Proof of Service of Notice of Action Pursuant to Labor Code 3853, Complaint, as to Geovanny Cifuentes |
|
February 16, 2024 | Docket Event | Proof of Personal Service- Notice of Action | |
February 02, 2024 | Docket Event |
Rejection/Correction Notice Electronic Rejection Notice re: Summons. Does not conform to complaint. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.