Case Last Refreshed: 3 weeks ago
Orange, Anita, Orange, Jerry, filed a(n) Insurance Coverage - Insurance case represented by Bazerkanian, Jack, against Allstate Insurance Company, Golden Empire Construction Co., Inc., Integon National Insurance Company, National General Insurance Company, Valley Cleaning &Amp; Restoration, Inc., (total of 5) See All represented by Feasel, Chris J, Hayes, Stephen M, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts Superior Court of California with Clark, Thomas S. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 01, 2024 |
Category18-Cv Insurance Coverage-Civil Unlimited |
Last RefreshedApril 06, 2024 |
Practice AreaInsurance |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeInsurance Coverage |
Filing Court HouseSuperior Court of California |
Electronic Rejection Notice
Date: March 26, 2024Electronic Rejection Notice
Date: February 01, 2024Case Management Conference
Date: July 30, 2024Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110
Date: May 16, 2024Order to Show Cause
Date: February 01, 202494939DEFEN002924
Date: March 29, 202494467Answe00bc88
Date: March 22, 20242024.03.14.Allstate Answer
Date: March 14, 20242024.03.07 Notice of Posting Jury Fees
Date: March 07, 202493472Answe00c2f0
Date: March 07, 20242024.02.01. Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: February 02, 20242024.02.01 Complaint
Date: February 01, 20242024.02.01 Summons
Date: February 01, 2024Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 01, 2060 | Docket Event | ||
July 30, 2024 | Hearing |
Case Number Case Management Conference Judge: Clark, Thomas S. |
|
May 16, 2024 | Hearing |
Case Number Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 Judge: Clark, Thomas S. |
|
March 29, 2024 | Hearing | Answer to Complaint | |
March 29, 2024 | Docket Event | 94939DEFEN002924 | |
March 26, 2024 | Docket Event |
Case Number Electronic Rejection Notice Answer- Caption does not conform exact to complaint. Please ensure caption conforms exact to operative complaint. See line 17-18 on page 1. |
|
March 26, 2024 | Hearing |
Electronic Rejection Notice Answer- Caption does not conform exact to complaint. Please ensure caption conforms exact to operative complaint. See line 17-18 on page 1. |
|
March 22, 2024 | Docket Event | 94467Answe00bc88 | |
March 14, 2024 | Hearing | Answer to Complaint | |
March 14, 2024 | Docket Event | 2024.03.14.Allstate Answer |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.