Case Last Refreshed: 1 week ago
Everett Clinton Scott, On Behalf Of All Others Similarly Situated, Scott, Everett Clinton, filed a(n) General Employment - Labor and Employment case represented by Bibiyan, David D, Klein, Jeffrey D., Mohseni, Farzan Bijan Amir, against Tridant Solutions, Inc., A California Corporation, represented by King, Christina R, Michalski, James W, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts Superior Court of California with Clark, Thomas S. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 23, 2024 |
Category15-Cv Other Employment - Civil Unlimited |
Last RefreshedApril 23, 2024 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Employment |
Filing Court HouseSuperior Court of California |
Order to Show Cause
Date: January 24, 2024Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110
Date: May 07, 2024Case Management Conference
Date: July 22, 2024Motion to Compel
Date: April 22, 2024Ruling
Date: April 22, 202496048Proof04ec7d
Date: April 16, 202496048Respo03bc13
Date: April 16, 202496048Decla0221f1
Date: April 16, 202496048Decla01ad29
Date: April 16, 202496048Reply001f56
Date: April 16, 202495634PLAIN0137ea
Date: April 09, 202495634PLAIN02136b
Date: April 09, 202495634DECLA00dad3
Date: April 09, 202494041Propo0541d7
Date: March 15, 202494041Proof04790d
Date: March 15, 202494041Decla0385a9
Date: March 15, 202494041Decla0286ad
Date: March 15, 202494041Decla01602b
Date: March 15, 202494041Motio00100d
Date: March 15, 202493829Proof00bd07
Date: March 13, 202493956Decla047dac
Date: March 14, 202493956Propo05a3c8
Date: March 14, 202493956Decla0376cd
Date: March 14, 202493956Decla026de9
Date: March 14, 202493956Motio00d31d
Date: March 14, 202493956Proof01eee9
Date: March 14, 202493422Notic00371d
Date: March 07, 202490544Civil029a07
Date: January 23, 202490544Compl00ea11
Date: January 23, 202490544Summo010ba9
Date: January 23, 2024Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 22, 2024 | Docket Event |
Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C) Case Management Conference Judge: Clark, Thomas S. |
|
May 07, 2024 | Docket Event |
Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C) Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 Judge: Clark, Thomas S. |
|
April 22, 2024 | Docket Event |
Motion to Compel 04/22/2024 Motion to Compel 3/15/2024 Defendant's Motion to Compel Arbitration |
|
April 22, 2024 | Hearing |
Motion to Compel 3/15/2024 Defendant's Motion to Compel Arbitration Judge: Clark, Thomas S. |
|
April 22, 2024 | Hearing |
Ruling 04/22/2024 Ruling Judge: Clark, Thomas S. |
|
April 22, 2024 | Hearing |
Court Use Only - Pre-Cleared Substantive/Demurrer 3/15/24 due: 3/19/24 w/1st appr fee; Def's Motion to Compel Arbitration; contact: Christina King (434) 316-8012 Judge: Clark, Thomas S. |
|
April 22, 2024 | Docket Event |
Court Use Only - Pre-Cleared Substantive/Demurrer 3/15/24 due: 3/19/24 w/1st appr fee; Def's Motion to Compel Arbitration; contact: Christina King (434) 316-8012 |
|
April 22, 2024 | Docket Event |
Court Use Only - Pre-Cleared Substantive/Demurrer 3/11/24 due: 3/14/24 w/1st appr fee; Def's Motion to Compel Arbitration; contact: Christina King (434) 316-8012 |
|
April 22, 2024 | Hearing |
Court Use Only - Pre-Cleared Substantive/Demurrer 3/11/24 due: 3/14/24 w/1st appr fee; Def's Motion to Compel Arbitration; contact: Christina King (434) 316-8012 Judge: Clark, Thomas S. |
|
April 16, 2024 | Docket Event | 96048Proof04ec7d |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.