Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
ROYAL BANK OF CANADA, A BANK INCORPORATED TO THE LAWS OF CANADA VS OLUYEDE ET AL
A 20-Cv Enforcement Of Judgment - Civil Unlimited case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Kern County. Judge Pulskamp, Gregory presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
January 18, 2024
Last Refreshed
May 29, 2024
Filing Location
Kern County, CA
Filing Court House
Superior Court of California
Category
20-CV Enforcement of Judgment - Civil Unlimited
Practice Area
Creditor
Matter Type
Judgment Enforcement
Status
Active
Overview
Causes of Action
22 FIRST CAUSE OF ACTION
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Documents
Case Management Conference
Date: Jul 17, 2024Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110
Date: May 29, 2024Decl of Michael Gless ISO Judgment
Date: May 21, 2024Judgment
Date: May 21, 2024Request for Dismissal Oluyede
Date: May 15, 2024Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110
Date: May 03, 202497145DECLA01b0d9
Date: May 01, 202497145Reque007e5b
Date: May 01, 2024Ruling
Date: Apr 08, 202492952Proof0008b6
Date: Feb 29, 2024Order to Show Cause
Date: Jan 19, 2024COMPLAINT TO ENFORCE FOREIGN COUNTRY JUDGMENT
Date: Jan 18, 2024RBC Civilcase Coversheet1
Date: Jan 18, 2024RBC - Final Summons
Date: Jan 18, 2024Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 17, 2024 | Docket Event |
Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C) Case Management Conference Judge: Pulskamp, Gregory |
|
May 29, 2024 | hearing |
Ruling 04/08/2024 Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 Judge: Pulskamp, Gregory |
|
May 21, 2024 | Docket Event | Decl of Michael Gless ISO Judgment | |
May 21, 2024 | Docket Event | Judgment | |
May 15, 2024 | hearing |
Request for Dismissal (Partial) without prejudice as to Defendants Olumayokun Oluyede and Olukemi Oludoyinsola Oluyede, only. |
|
May 15, 2024 | Docket Event |
Request for Dismissal (Partial) without prejudice as to Defendants Olumayokun Oluyede and Olukemi Oludoyinsola Oluyede, only. |
|
May 15, 2024 | Docket Event | Request for Dismissal Oluyede | |
May 15, 2024 | hearing |
Request for Dismissal (Partial) without prejudice as to the entire action |
|
May 15, 2024 | Docket Event |
Request for Dismissal (Partial) without prejudice as to the entire action |
|
May 03, 2024 | hearing |
Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C) Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 Judge: Pulskamp, Gregory |
|
May 01, 2024 | Docket Event |
Request for Entry of Default and Court Judgment As to Oluwadamilola Oluyede aka Dami O. Oluyede on complaint filed 1/18/24 |
|
May 01, 2024 | hearing |
Declaration of Michael M Gless in support of Plaintiff's Request for Default Judgment of Foreign Judgment (Candada) |
|
May 01, 2024 | hearing |
Request for Entry of Default and Court Judgment As to Oluwadamilola Oluyede aka Dami O. Oluyede on complaint filed 1/18/24 |
|
May 01, 2024 | Docket Event |
Declaration of Michael M Gless in support of Plaintiff's Request for Default Judgment of Foreign Judgment (Candada) |
|
May 01, 2024 | Docket Event | 97145DECLA01b0d9 | |
May 01, 2024 | Docket Event | 97145Reque007e5b | |
April 19, 2024 | hearing |
Minute Order/Notice of Trial/MSC/Final Case Management Conf RULING 04/08/2024. *UNABLE TO FORWARD* |
|
April 19, 2024 | Docket Event |
Minute Order/Notice of Trial/MSC/Final Case Management Conf RULING 04/08/2024. *UNABLE TO FORWARD* |
|
April 19, 2024 | Docket Event | 96314DECLA01ce99 | |
April 19, 2024 | Docket Event | 96314Reque0025f3 | |
April 18, 2024 | Docket Event |
Request For Entry of Default Not Entered 1b Does not conform to the Complaint. |
|
April 18, 2024 | hearing |
Request For Entry of Default Not Entered 1b Does not conform to the Complaint. |
|
April 08, 2024 | hearing |
Ruling 04/08/2024 Ruling |
|
February 29, 2024 | hearing |
Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint as to Oluwadamilola Oluyede aka Dami O Oluyede via personal service |
|
February 29, 2024 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint as to Oluwadamilola Oluyede aka Dami O Oluyede via personal service |
|
February 29, 2024 | Docket Event | 92952Proof0008b6 | |
January 19, 2024 | Docket Event |
Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C) Order to Show Cause Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 07/17/2024 Hearing Time: 8:30 am Hearing Department/Division: J |
|
January 19, 2024 | Docket Event | Summons Issued and Filed | |
January 19, 2024 | hearing | Civil and Small Claims Documents | |
January 19, 2024 | hearing |
Order to Show Cause Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 07/17/2024 Hearing Time: 8:30 am Hearing Department/Division: J |
|
January 18, 2024 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010) | |
January 18, 2024 | hearing | Complaint | |
January 18, 2024 | Docket Event | COMPLAINT TO ENFORCE FOREIGN COUNTRY JUDGMENT | |
January 18, 2024 | Docket Event | RBC Civilcase Coversheet1 | |
January 18, 2024 | Docket Event | RBC - Final Summons |