Case Last Refreshed: 1 day ago
Granite Construction Company, A California Corporation, filed a(n) General Property - Property case represented by Kuhs, Robert G, against Burtch Trucking, Inc., A California Corporation, Ceres Enterprises, Inc., A California Corporation, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts Superior Court of California with Smith, T presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 16, 2024 |
Category26-Cv Other Real Property-Civil Unlimited |
Last RefreshedApril 28, 2024 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Property |
Filing Court HouseSuperior Court of California |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Order to Show Cause
Date: January 17, 2024Case Management Conference
Date: July 15, 2024Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110
Date: May 01, 2024Certificate of Progress re Service of Complaint
Date: March 15, 2024Notice of Pendency of Action
Date: March 14, 2024Notice of Related Case
Date: January 17, 2024Complaint to Foreclose Mechanic's Lien
Date: January 17, 2024Summons
Date: January 17, 2024Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: January 17, 2024Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 15, 2024 | Docket Event |
Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C) Case Management Conference Judge: Smith, T. Mark |
|
May 01, 2024 | Hearing |
Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C) Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 Judge: Smith, T. Mark |
|
April 26, 2024 | Docket Event | Request for Dismissal without Prejudice | |
April 26, 2024 | Docket Event | Request for Dismissal (Entire) | |
March 15, 2024 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Progress Request for extension of time for filing of a Proof of Service |
|
March 15, 2024 | Hearing |
Ruling/Certificate of Progress Extension Granted. Plaintiff to file proof of service not later than 4/18/2024 |
|
March 15, 2024 | Hearing |
Certificate of Progress Request for extension of time for filing of a Proof of Service |
|
March 15, 2024 | Docket Event |
Ruling/Certificate of Progress Extension Granted. Plaintiff to file proof of service not later than 4/18/2024 |
|
March 15, 2024 | Docket Event | Certificate of Progress re Service of Complaint | |
March 14, 2024 | Hearing | NOTICE OF PENDENCY OF ACTION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.