Case Last Refreshed: 3 weeks ago
Ortiz, Adela, Ortiz, Oscar, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Miller, Forrest R, against Macaluso, Brian, Progressive Casualty Insurance Company, represented by Czeshinski, Michael J, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts Superior Court of California with Pulskamp, Gregory presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 08, 2024 |
Category22-Cv Auto - Civil Unlimited |
Last RefreshedApril 08, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court HouseSuperior Court of California |
Case Management Conference
Date: July 08, 2024Electronic Rejection Notice
Date: January 09, 2024Electronic Rejection Notice
Date: January 09, 2024Electronic Rejection Notice
Date: January 08, 2024Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110
Date: April 22, 2024Electronic Rejection Notice
Date: March 01, 2024Electronic Rejection Notice
Date: January 09, 2024Order to Show Cause
Date: January 08, 2024Notice of Withdrawal
Date: April 01, 202493659Reque005751
Date: March 11, 2024jury dep__24030614020
Date: March 06, 2024ortiz ans__24030614010
Date: March 06, 2024Amended Notice of Special Motion to Strike
Date: March 04, 2024Progressive Anti-SLAPP
Date: February 27, 202492199Proof003b5b
Date: February 17, 202489933Summo001ed5
Date: January 12, 2024Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 08, 2024 | Docket Event |
Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C) Case Management Conference Judge: Pulskamp, Gregory |
|
April 22, 2024 | Docket Event |
Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C) Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 Judge: Pulskamp, Gregory |
|
April 09, 2024 | Hearing |
Motion to Strike (ANTI SLAPP) Per CCP 425.16 Amended Notice 3/4/2024 Special motion to strike ANTI SLAPP Judge: Pulskamp, Gregory |
|
April 09, 2024 | Docket Event |
Motion to Strike (ANTI SLAPP) Per CCP 425.16 Amended Notice 3/4/2024 Special motion to strike ANTI SLAPP |
|
April 09, 2024 | Docket Event |
Court Use Only - Pre-Cleared Regular 2/27. due 3/1. Progressive, Special motion to strike ANTI SLAPP; Michelle 818 788 9500 |
|
April 09, 2024 | Hearing |
Court Use Only - Pre-Cleared Regular 2/27. due 3/1. Progressive, Special motion to strike ANTI SLAPP; Michelle 818 788 9500 Judge: Pulskamp, Gregory |
|
April 02, 2024 | Hearing | Notice of Withdrawal of Defendant Progressive Casualty Insurance Company's Special Motion to Strike (Anti-Slapp) Plaintiffs' Entire Complaint | |
April 02, 2024 | Docket Event | Notice of Withdrawal of Defendant Progressive Casualty Insurance Company's Special Motion to Strike (Anti-Slapp) Plaintiffs' Entire Complaint | |
April 01, 2024 | Docket Event | Notice of Withdrawal | |
March 11, 2024 | Hearing |
Request for Dismissal (Partial) without prejudice as to the Complaint; Progressive Casualty Insurance Company |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.